ND SB2062 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 4.1-53-48, subsection 3 of section 4.1-53-57, subsection 2 of section 4.1-53-61, subsection 2 of section 4.1-55-17, and section 4.1-57-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requirements for certification under the plant variety protection act; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requirements for certification under the plant variety protection act; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 03/21
2023-03-21SenateSigned by Governor 03/20
2023-03-15SenateSent to Governor
2023-03-15SenateSigned by President
2023-03-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-14SenateReturned to Senate
2023-03-13HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2023-03-09HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1
2023-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2023-02-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Agriculture
2023-01-17HouseReceived from Senate
2023-01-16SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2023-01-13SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2023-01-13SenateCommittee Hearing 11:10
2023-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Agriculture and Veterans Affairs

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback