ND SB2057 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 11 of section 65-05-12.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to workers' compensation permanent partial impairment awards for loss of vision; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 11 of section 65-05-12.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to workers' compensation permanent partial impairment awards for loss of vision; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-09 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-05 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-04 | Second reading passed, y 092 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-03-03 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and La | |
2009-02-02 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-30 | Second reading passed, y 045 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-01-29 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-28 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and La |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2057.html |