ND SB2055 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 26.1-26-13.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the withdrawal of producer licensing applications; to amend and reenact sections 26.1-26-30, 26.1-26-33, subsection 1 of section 26.1-26-52, subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 26.1-26.8-06, subdivision a of subsection 2 of section 26.1-26.8-09, and subsections 7 and 8 of section 26.1-33.4-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the contents of producer licenses, producer notification of electronic mail address changes, automobile rental company staff soliciting insurance, and the renewal of public adjuster and life settlement licenses; and to repeal sections 26.1-26-37 and 26.1-26-46 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to physical copies of a producer's license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical copies of a producer's license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 03/15
2023-03-15SenateSigned by Governor 03/14
2023-03-14SenateSent to Governor
2023-03-09SenateSigned by President
2023-03-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-08SenateReturned to Senate
2023-03-07HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 4
2023-03-06HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2023-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2023-02-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor
2023-01-09HouseReceived from Senate
2023-01-06SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 0
2023-01-06SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0
2023-01-04SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Industry and Business

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback