ND SB2051 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapters 25-03.2 and 50-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fingerprint criminal history record investigations for psychiatric residential facilities for children and for shelter care programs; and to amend and reenact subdivision f of subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and sections 25-03.2-03, 25-03.2-04, 50-06-01.9, 50-11-06.8, 50-12-03, and 50-25.1-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fingerprint criminal history record checks for certified family foster home for children providers and psychiatric residential treatment facility for children, identifying who the department of health and human services may require criminal history record checks from, and criminal history record checks for volunteers and students for field placement at child-placing agencies and children's advocacy centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fingerprint criminal history record checks for certified family foster home for children providers and psychiatric residential treatment facility for children, identifying who the department of health and human services may require criminal history record checks from, and criminal history record checks for volunteers and students for field placement at child-placing agencies and children's advocacy centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 04/14
2023-04-17SenateSigned by Governor 04/13
2023-04-11SenateSent to Governor
2023-04-11SenateSigned by President
2023-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-04-06SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
2023-04-06SenateConcurred
2023-03-29SenateCommittee Hearing 11:40
2023-03-10SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2023-03-09HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0
2023-03-08HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-03-07HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2023-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 11:16
2023-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2023-03-01HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2023-02-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Human Services
2023-01-12HouseReceived from Senate
2023-01-11SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
2023-01-09SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-01-06SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1
2023-01-04SenateCommittee Hearing 01:00
2023-01-04SenateCommittee Hearing 08:45
2023-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Human Services

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/bill-overview/bo2051.html
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-8049-01000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-8049-02000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-8049-03000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-8049-04000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-8049-01001a.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-8049-02001a.pdf
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/sr-dailyjnl-05.pdf#Page173
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/hr-dailyjnl-40.pdf#Page1161
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/sr-dailyjnl-60.pdf#Page1457

Bill Comments

feedback