ND SB2044 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-11 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-27-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to transportation funding and expenditure reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation funding and expenditure reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-11SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
2023-01-10SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2023-01-10SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2023-01-04SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2023-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback