ND SB2038 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15-10-12, 54-44.1-04, 54-44.1-06, and 54-44.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the appropriation of higher education institutions' special revenue funds; budget requests and block grant appropriations for the North Dakota university system; cancellation of unexpended appropriations of the North Dakota university system; to provide for a report; to provide for legislative council studies of higher education; to provide legislative intent for higher education accountability measures; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15-10-12, 54-44.1-04, 54-44.1-06, and 54-44.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the appropriation of higher education institutions' special revenue funds; budget requests and block grant appropriations for the North Dakota university system; cancellation of unexpended appropriations of the North Dakota university system; to provide for a report; to provide for legislative council studies of higher education; to provide legislative intent for higher education accountability measures; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 087 nays 005 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-29 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-22 | Conf comm appointed Skarphol R. Kelsch Williams | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Flakoll G. Lee Bakke | |
2009-04-16 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-15 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-15 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 084 nays 006 | |
2009-04-14 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 023 n 001 | |
2009-03-16 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-03-10 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-17 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 001 | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-01-20 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-01-13 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2038.html |