ND SB2028 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 15.1-21-17.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to interim assessment of students.
Title
Interim assessment of students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/20 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 29 |
2023-03-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 1 |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 04:15 |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-03-01 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |
2023-01-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |