ND SB2024 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the racing commission; to create and enact two new sections to chapter 53-06.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of live racing and pari-mutuel wagering; to amend and reenact sections 53-06.2-02, 53-06.2-03, 53-06.2-04, 53-06.2-05, 53-06.2-10, 53-06.2-10.1, 53-06.2-11, 53-06.2-12, 53-06.2-13, 53-06.2-14, 53-06.2-15, and 53-06.2-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of live racing and pari-mutuel wagering; to provide for a report to the legislative council; to provide for transition; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the racing commission; to create and enact two new sections to chapter 53-06.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of live racing and pari-mutuel wagering; to amend and reenact sections 53-06.2-02, 53-06.2-03, 53-06.2-04, 53-06.2-05, 53-06.2-10, 53-06.2-10.1, 53-06.2-11, 53-06.2-12, 53-06.2-13, 53-06.2-14, 53-06.2-15, and 53-06.2-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulation of live racing and pari-mutuel wagering; to provide for a report to the legislative council; to provide for transition; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-18 | Signed by Governor, but item veto 0518 | |
2009-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-02 | Signed by President | |
2009-05-02 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-01 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 071 nays 021 | |
2009-05-01 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed, yeas 029 nays 018 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-30 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed Berg Kempenich S. Meyer | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Fischer Grindberg Seymour | |
2009-04-16 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-15 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-15 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 070 nays 021 | |
2009-04-14 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 019 n 005 | |
2009-02-27 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-13 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-12 | Second reading, passed, yeas 038 nays 009 | |
2009-02-10 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 006 | |
2009-01-27 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 03:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2024.html |