ND SB2019 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state board for career and technical education; to provide for a state board of higher education study; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state board for career and technical education; to provide for a state board of higher education study; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by President | |
2009-05-02 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-05-02 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 087 nays 000 | |
2009-05-02 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-01 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-05-01 | Second reading passed, y 046 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-05-01 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-05-01 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-17 | Conf comm appointed Hawken Klein Kroeber | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Grindberg Christmann Seymour | |
2009-04-14 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-09 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-09 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-09 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 090 nays 003 | |
2009-04-03 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 019 n 001 | |
2009-02-26 | Committee Hearing 01:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-18 | Motion to reconsider laid on table | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-02-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 014 n 000 | |
2009-01-22 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2019.html |