ND SB2018 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the state historical society; to amend and reenact sections 55-03-01 and 55-03-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permit fees; to provide an exemption; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Title
Permit fees; to provide an exemption; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to provide for a legislative management study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 58 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor 05/05 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 70 nays 22 |
2023-04-26 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Conference committee appointed Richter Martinson Hanson |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Meyer Sorvaag Krebsbach |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-04-11 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 58 nays 31 |
2023-04-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 3 3 |
2023-04-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:11 |
2023-03-31 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-03-03 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 06:20 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:55 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Appropriations |