ND HCR3013 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Signed by President
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution recognizing December 6th as "Miner's Day" and urging the federal government to refrain from enacting regulations that threaten the reliability and affordability of electric power in North Dakota and to increase support for research, development, and deployment for next generation carbon-based energy generation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution recognizing December 6th as "Miner's Day" and urging the federal government to refrain from enacting regulations that threaten the reliability and affordability of electric power in North Dakota and to increase support for research, development, and deployment for next generation carbon-based energy generation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23SenateSigned by President
2023-03-22HouseReturned to House
2023-03-21SenateSecond reading, adopted
2023-03-17SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 0 2
2023-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2023-02-16SenateReceived from House
2023-02-15HouseSecond reading, adopted
2023-02-14HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-02-13HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2023-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-02-10HouseCommittee Hearing 11:20
2023-01-26HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback