ND HB1545 | 2023 | 68th Legislative Assembly Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Filed with Secretary Of State 10/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an exemption relating to refinancing loans from the infrastructure revolving loan fund; to provide for retroactive application; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide an exemption relating to refinancing loans from the infrastructure revolving loan fund; to provide for retroactive application; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-10-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-30HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 10/25
2023-10-25HouseSigned by Governor 10/25
2023-10-25HouseSent to Governor
2023-10-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-10-25SenateSigned by President
2023-10-25HouseReturned to House
2023-10-25SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3
2023-10-24SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0
2023-10-24SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Joint Policy
2023-10-24SenateReceived from House
2023-10-24HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 6
2023-10-23HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0
2023-10-23HouseCommittee Hearing 10:50
2023-10-23HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Joint Policy

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback