ND HB1513 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-39.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales and use tax exemption for materials used to construct, expand, or upgrade a hospice care facility owned by a hospice program; to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 57-40.2-03.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a use tax exemption for materials used to construct, expand, or upgrade a hospice care facility owned by a hospice program; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A use tax exemption for materials used to construct, expand, or upgrade a hospice care facility owned by a hospice program; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 3 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-28SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
2023-03-23SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0
2023-03-22SenateCommittee Hearing 09:27
2023-03-20SenateCommittee Hearing 11:30
2023-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2023-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation
2023-03-03SenateReceived from House
2023-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 5
2023-02-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-02-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0
2023-02-14HouseCommittee Hearing 04:00
2023-02-14HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2023-02-07HouseCommittee Hearing 10:04
2023-02-06HouseRereferred to Finance and Taxation
2023-02-01HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1
2023-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 03:21
2023-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2023-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback