ND HB1463 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for collective bargaining for law enforcement officers and paid full-time firefighters.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for collective bargaining for law enforcement officers and paid full-time firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 23 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 64 |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 6 0 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |