ND HB1447 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to higher education student voting documents; and to amend and reenact section 16.1-01-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to acceptable forms of identification for purposes of voting.
Title
Acceptable forms of identification for purposes of voting.
Sponsors
Rep. Claire Cory [R] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] | Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R] |
Sen. Ray Holmberg [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2021-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-31 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 7 |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2021-01-21 | House | Rereferred to Government and Veterans Affairs |
2021-01-21 | House | Request return from committee |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |