ND HB1445 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 53-06.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the treatment of cash shorts and interest and penalties incurred in gaming.
Title
The treatment of cash shorts and interest and penalties incurred in gaming.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Grueneich [R] | Sen. Claire Cory [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] |
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] | Sen. Cole Conley [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 55 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 55 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 55 nays 35 |
2023-02-09 | House | Laid over two legislative days |
2023-02-08 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-07 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 5 0 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 11:20 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |