ND HB1437 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact sections 11-09.1-05.2 and 40-05.1-06.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to city or county sales tax revenue transfers to school districts for bonded indebtedness; and to repeal sections 11-09.1-05.1 and 40-05.1-06.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the prohibition on transferring city or county sales tax revenue to school districts.
Title
The prohibition on transferring city or county sales tax revenue to school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 30 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 30 nays 58 |
2019-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2019-02-18 | House | Rereferred to Political Subdivisions |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2019-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |