ND HB1437 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 30 nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 30 nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 12.1-30-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to Sunday closing.
Title
Sunday closing.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Randy Boehning [R] | Rep. Nancy Johnson [R] |
Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 30 nays 62 |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 4 2 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1437.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0009-01000.pdf |