ND HB1436 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-08 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact four new sections to chapter 4.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of beef commission districts, the selection of commission members, and the referral of cattle assessments; to amend and reenact sections 4.1-03-01, 4.1-03-02, 4.1-03-03, 4.1-03-04, and 4.1-03-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of a cattle industry representative, the election and terms of members to the North Dakota beef commission, and requiring livestock auction markets and livestock dealers to forward names of cattle sellers; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The definition of a cattle industry representative, the election and terms of members to the North Dakota beef commission, and requiring livestock auction markets and livestock dealers to forward names of cattle sellers; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 26 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-08HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 67
2023-02-07HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-02-06HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 4 1
2023-02-03HouseCommittee Hearing 01:30
2023-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2023-01-17HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Agriculture

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback