ND HB1430 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 67
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 19-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the use of medical marijuana; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The use of medical marijuana; to provide a penalty; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Anderson [D] | Rep. Eliot Glassheim [D] | Rep. Kathy Hawken [R] | Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] |
Rep. Marvin Nelson [D] | Rep. Mary Schneider [D] | Rep. Marie Strinden [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 26 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 67 |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 3 2 |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |