ND HB1418 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 50-06.4-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the membership of the brain injury advisory council.
Title
The membership of the brain injury advisory council.
Sponsors
Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. Hamida Dakane [D] | Rep. Zachary Ista [D] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] |
Rep. Eric Murphy [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Mary Schneider [D] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] |
Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24 |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2023-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2023-04-12 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Weston Clemens K. Roers |
2023-04-03 | House | Conference committee appointed Fegley Frelich Dobervich |
2023-04-03 | House | Refused to concur |
2023-03-20 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 0 2 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:24 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-03 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 11:06 |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |