ND HB1404 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-10 and a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to carrying a concealed firearm on a college campus; to amend and reenact section 62.1-01-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the limitation on authority of a political subdivision regarding firearms; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The limitation on authority of a political subdivision regarding firearms; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Heilman [R] | Rep. Landon Bahl [R] | Rep. Cole Christensen [R] | Rep. Dori Hauck [R] |
Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Brandon Prichard [R] | Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 32 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-20 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 32 nays 61 |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 2 2 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:10 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |