ND HB1390 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax deduction for certain social security benefits; and to provide an effective date.
Title
An income tax deduction for certain social security benefits; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Rep. Phillip Mueller [D] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Sen. Curtis Olafson [R] |
Sen. Gerald Uglem [R] | Rep. Lonny Winrich [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 63 | |
2011-02-08 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 | |
2011-01-25 | Committee Hearing 09:15 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba1390.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0551-03000.pdf |