ND HB1369 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 15.1-39 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment of an education empowerment program; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
The establishment of an education empowerment program; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Mike Schatz [R] |
Rep. Michelle Strinden [R] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 45 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 49 |
2021-02-12 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-02-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |