ND HB1324 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 16.1-01-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to sufficiency of petitions as determined by the secretary of state.
Title
Sufficiency of petitions as determined by the secretary of state.
Sponsors
Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Rep. Steve Vetter [R] | Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] |
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21 |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor 04/20 |
2023-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 3 |
2023-04-12 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Appoint Sen. Cleary to replace Sen. Estenson on conference committee |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Lee Barta Estenson |
2023-04-03 | House | Conference committee appointed Vetter Hoverson McLeod |
2023-04-03 | House | Refused to concur |
2023-03-31 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to State and Local Government |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-03 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 1 |
2023-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 09:25 |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 08:45 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Government and Veterans Affairs |