ND HB1310 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-29 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-29 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 47-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to electric vehicle charging station installation in condominiums; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Electric vehicle charging station installation in condominiums; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-29 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/28 |
2023-04-28 | House | Signed by Governor 04/27 |
2023-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2023-04-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 11 |
2023-04-24 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Paulson Rummel Larsen |
2023-04-04 | House | Conference committee appointed Boschee Wagner Christy |
2023-04-04 | House | Refused to concur |
2023-03-31 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Transportation |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 8 |
2023-02-02 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3 |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 03:24 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 03:10 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-01-12 | House | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2023-01-12 | House | Request return from committee |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Transportation |