ND HB1292 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 6-09-49 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to capital construction projects; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Capital construction projects; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Rep. Glenn Bosch [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] | Sen. Sean Cleary [R] |
Sen. Doug Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11 |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2023-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2023-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2023-03-27 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 38 nays 8 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:10 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Industry and Business |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry and Business |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Political Subdivisions |