ND HB1282 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 26 of section 57-39.2-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales and use tax exemption for feminine hygiene products; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A sales and use tax exemption for feminine hygiene products; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 33 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-17HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 56
2023-02-16HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 5 2
2023-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2023-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2023-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback