ND HB1253 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 39-06.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the amount of statutory fees for traffic offenses; to amend and reenact section 39-21-44.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to transportation of aggregate material; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation of aggregate material; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 24 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-13HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 66
2023-02-13HouseAmendment failed, placed on calendar
2023-02-09HouseLaid over two legislative days
2023-02-08HouseLaid over one legislative day
2023-02-07HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0
2023-02-03HouseCommittee Hearing 09:45
2023-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2023-01-10HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Transportation

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback