ND HB1252 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 58-08-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to compensation of township treasurers.
Title
Compensation of township treasurers.
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Sen. John Andrist [R] |
Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2013-03-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 2 |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |