ND HB1224 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 20.1-01-02 and 20.1-05-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the possession of handguns and use of dogs in the recovery of big game animals.
Title
The possession of handguns and use of dogs in the recovery of big game animals.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/16 |
2023-03-17 | House | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2023-03-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:15 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 10:20 |
2023-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |