ND HB1211 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 53
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 53
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 12.1-32-09.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to sentencing violent offenders; and to provide for retroactive application.
Title
Sentencing violent offenders; and to provide for retroactive application.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Jake Blum [R] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Steve Vetter [R] |
Sen. Kyle Davison [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 37 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 37 nays 53 |
2019-02-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 10:20 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |