ND HB1208 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-06-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to individuals who are exempt from having an operator's license.
Title
Individuals who are exempt from having an operator's license.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Grueneich [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Jared Hagert [R] |
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 17 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 75 |
2023-01-20 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2023-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Transportation |