ND HB1188 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-02-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a certificate of completion for special education technicians; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A certificate of completion for special education technicians; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | House | Signed by Governor 03/25 |
2021-03-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-22 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 2, Emergency clause carried |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Education Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3, Emergency clause carried |
2021-02-03 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |