ND HB1177 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 2-06-06, subsection
Title
Compensation of members of political subdivision boards and committees.
Sponsors
Rep. David Drovdal [R] | Rep. Nancy Johnson [R] | Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Sen. Stanley Lyson [R] | Sen. John Warner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Signed by Governor 04/02 |
2013-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-19 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 4 |
2013-01-29 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-01-28 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 2 |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |