ND HB1176 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact two new sections to chapter 57-38 and two new subdivisions to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an adoption tax credit and a tax credit for contributions to a maternity home, child-placing agency, or pregnancy help center; and to provide an effective date.
Title
An adoption tax credit and a tax credit for contributions to a maternity home, child-placing agency, or pregnancy help center; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. SuAnn Olson [R] | Rep. Jay Fisher [R] | Rep. Kathy Frelich [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] |
Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] | Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/24 |
2023-04-25 | House | Signed by Governor 04/21 |
2023-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2023-04-12 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 1 |
2023-04-12 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-07 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (House accede) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Magrum Patten Piepkorn |
2023-04-03 | House | Conference committee appointed Steiner Fisher D. Anderson |
2023-04-03 | House | Refused to concur |
2023-03-14 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Division B passed |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Division A passed |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Division of bill |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:31 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:57 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2 |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 5 2 |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 02:46 |
2023-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |