ND HB1163 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to optional career and technical education high school curriculum; and to amend and reenact section 15.1-21-02.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to minimum requirements for high school graduation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minimum requirements for high school graduation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-09HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 75
2023-02-07HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0
2023-02-07HouseCommittee Hearing 11:18
2023-01-31HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2023-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 04:21
2023-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Education

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback