ND HB1123 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-01-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the membership, spending authority, and funding for the kindergarten through grade twelve education coordination council.
Title
The membership, spending authority, and funding for the kindergarten through grade twelve education coordination council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2023-03-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-09 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2023-01-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 04:14 |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |