ND HB1117 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 24-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to designating the bridge on state highway 18 as the veterans memorial bridge; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the bridge on state highway 18 as the veterans memorial bridge; and to provide a continuing appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 03/15
2023-03-16HouseSigned by Governor 03/15
2023-03-14HouseSent to Governor
2023-03-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-08SenateSigned by President
2023-03-07HouseReturned to House
2023-03-06SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2023-03-03SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0
2023-03-02SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-02-10SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Transportation
2023-01-17SenateReceived from House
2023-01-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2023-01-12HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2023-01-12HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Transportation

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback