ND HB1116 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-09-08, 16.1-08.1-02.3, and 16.1-08.1-05 relating to campaign contribution statements for candidates seeking a school district office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-09-08, 16.1-08.1-02.3, and 16.1-08.1-05 relating to campaign contribution statements for candidates seeking a school district office.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 3 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-31SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 41
2023-03-28SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2023-03-24SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2023-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:10
2023-02-13SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to State and Local Government
2023-01-24SenateReceived from House
2023-01-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 55 nays 37
2023-01-20HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1
2023-01-20HouseCommittee Hearing 10:40
2023-01-20HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2023-01-13HouseRereferred to Political Subdivisions
2023-01-13HouseRequest return from committee
2023-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback