ND HB1108 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 23.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to international climate control regulations.
Title
International climate control regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/23 |
2023-03-23 | House | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2023-03-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-16 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 12 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 11 |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:55 |
2023-01-13 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |