ND HB1096 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 64-02-08.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to permit fees for registered service company and person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit fees for registered service company and person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 03/15
2023-03-16HouseSigned by Governor 03/15
2023-03-14HouseSent to Governor
2023-03-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-09SenateSigned by President
2023-03-08HouseReturned to House
2023-03-07SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2023-03-06SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2023-03-02SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2023-02-08SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Agriculture and Veterans Affairs
2023-01-24SenateReceived from House
2023-01-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2023-01-19HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2023-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback