ND HB1070 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact three new sections to chapter 37-17.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the establishment and administration of a hazard mitigation revolving loan fund; to amend and reenact subsection 12 of section 54-16-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to emergency commission authorizations; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
Emergency commission authorizations; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13 |
2023-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2023-04-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2023-04-06 | House | Concurred |
2023-04-05 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2023-03-31 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 2 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:51 |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2023-02-09 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 21 0 2 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Hearing 03:29 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-01-16 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-01-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2023-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 03:45 |
2023-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Government and Veterans Affairs |