ND HB1060 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 24-18-06, subsection 3 of section 39-12-02, and subsection 6 of section 39-12-05.3 of the of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to special permit fees.
Title
Special permit fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-16 | House | Signed by Governor 03/15 |
2023-03-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-06 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Transportation |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2023-01-06 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-01-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Transportation |