ND HB1042 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 11-19.1-11, 11-19.1-13, and 11-19.1-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to autopsies, determination of cause of death, and certification of coroner fees in situations involving the unexplained sudden death in infant or child with or without intrinsic or extrinsic factors, or both.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autopsies, determination of cause of death, and certification of coroner fees in situations involving the unexplained sudden death in infant or child with or without intrinsic or extrinsic factors, or both.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 03/15
2023-03-16HouseSigned by Governor 03/15
2023-03-14HouseSent to Governor
2023-03-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-10SenateSigned by President
2023-03-09HouseReturned to House
2023-03-08SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2023-03-07SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1
2023-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 11:21
2023-03-01SenateCommittee Hearing 03:00
2023-03-01SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2023-02-13SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Human Services
2023-01-09SenateReceived from House
2023-01-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 2
2023-01-06HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2023-01-04HouseCommittee Hearing 11:15
2023-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Human Services

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback