ND HB1035 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 82
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the cross-disability advisory council; to repeal section 50-06-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the autism spectrum disorder task force; to provide for a report; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The autism spectrum disorder task force; to provide for a report; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 11 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-22HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 11 nays 82
2023-02-16HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 22 0 1
2023-02-16HouseCommittee Hearing 10:17
2023-02-15HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2023-02-08HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2023-02-08HouseAmendment adopted
2023-02-07HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2023-02-06HouseCommittee Hearing 03:02
2023-01-04HouseCommittee Hearing 10:45
2023-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Human Services

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback