ND HB1001 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the legislative branch of state government; to amend and reenact sections 54-03-20 and 54-35-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to legislative compensation; to provide a report; to provide an exemption; to provide for application, transfer, and cancellation of unexpended appropriations; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative compensation; to provide a report; to provide an exemption; to provide for application, transfer, and cancellation of unexpended appropriations; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-25HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 04/21
2023-04-24HouseSigned by Governor 04/20
2023-04-13HouseSent to Governor
2023-04-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-04-13SenateSigned by President
2023-04-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 7, Emergency clause carried
2023-04-11HouseConcurred
2023-04-05HouseReturned to House (12)
2023-04-04SenateEmergency clause carried
2023-04-04SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 40 nays 7
2023-04-04SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-04-03SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 0 0
2023-03-30SenateCommittee Hearing 04:01
2023-03-27SenateCommittee Hearing 04:00
2023-03-22SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2023-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred to Appropriations
2023-03-03SenateReceived from House
2023-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 6, Emergency clause carried
2023-02-17HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-02-16HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 2 0
2023-02-15HouseCommittee Hearing 05:00
2023-02-14HouseCommittee Hearing 10:49
2023-02-10HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2023-02-07HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2023-02-03HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2023-01-17HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2023-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred to Appropriations

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback