ND 4014 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution supporting the development of the unmanned aircraft systems industry in North Dakota and throughout the United States, congratulating the Federal Aviation Administration on the first Beyond Visual Line of Sight Certificate of Authorization in the United States, and encouraging further cooperation with the Federal Aviation Administration to safely integrate unmanned aircraft systems into the national airspace.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution supporting the development of the unmanned aircraft systems industry in North Dakota and throughout the United States, congratulating the Federal Aviation Administration on the first Beyond Visual Line of Sight Certificate of Authorization in the United States, and encouraging further cooperation with the Federal Aviation Administration to safely integrate unmanned aircraft systems into the national airspace.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - House Second reading, adopted (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-21SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 04/21
2017-04-21SenateSigned by President
2017-04-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-20SenateReturned to Senate
2017-04-20HouseSecond reading, adopted yeas 92 nays 0
2017-04-20HouseIntroduced, first reading
2017-03-20HouseReceived from Senate
2017-03-17SenateSecond reading, adopted
2017-03-17SenateIntroduced, first reading

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback