ND SCR4013 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to pass the North Dakota Trust Lands Completion Act.
Title
A concurrent resolution urging Congress to pass the North Dakota Trust Lands Completion Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Marcellais [D] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Jordan Kannianen [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
Rep. Wayne Trottier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/09 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-29 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |