ND SCR4013 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the process necessary to replace the Life Skills and Transition Center in Grafton with statewide services for individuals with disabilities.
Title
A concurrent resolution requesting the Legislative Management to consider studying the process necessary to replace the Life Skills and Transition Center in Grafton with statewide services for individuals with disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Senate | Second reading, failed to adopt |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba4013.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-3044-01000.pdf |